IA HF658 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act increasing certain penalties for speeding in a motor vehicle, providing for the use of the additional moneys, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 191; See HF 2639.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act increasing certain penalties for speeding in a motor vehicle, providing for the use of the additional moneys, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 191; See HF 2639.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 589.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-03-09HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2020 12:30PM House Lounge.
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Jones and Kurth. H.J. 198.
2020-02-04HousePursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 192.
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee: Worthan, Kacena and Paustian. H.J. 109.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Public Safety. H.J. 755.
2019-03-18HouseFiscal note.
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 472.

Same As/Similar To

HSB191 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 421.
HF2639 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback