IA HF657 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 1135.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 1135.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to preparation and issuance of vital statistics certificates. (Formerly HSB 238)
Title
A bill for an act relating to preparation and issuance of vital statistics certificates. (Formerly HSB 238)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to Local Government. H.J. 1135. |
2015-05-13 | House | Amendment H-1353 filed. H.J. 1067. |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment H-1347 filed. H.J. 1052. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 922. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF657 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF657.html |