IA HF655 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting interference with the transportation of an agricultural animal, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 188.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting interference with the transportation of an agricultural animal, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 188.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 937. |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 936. |
2021-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 765. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 659. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 657. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 421. S.J. 656. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 421. S.J. 576. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 576. |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 686. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 503. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1166 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 421.
HSB188 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 655.
SF421 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 657.
HSB188 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 655.
SF421 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 657.