IA HF64 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-18 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 123.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-18 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 123.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 123. |
Same As/Similar To
SF60 (Similar To) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 207. S.J. 269.
SF207 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 547. S.J. 548.
SF547 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1030.
SF207 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 547. S.J. 548.
SF547 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1030.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF64 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF64.html |