IA HF639 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 252 & HSB 28.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 252 & HSB 28.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20. |
2017-04-14 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 1002. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB28 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178.
HF252 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
HF252 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF639 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF639.html |