IA HF638 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Amendment H-8306 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to landlord remedies and procedures relating to failure to timely pay rent, abandonment, and forcible entry and detainer. (Formerly HSB 116.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to landlord remedies and procedures relating to failure to timely pay rent, abandonment, and forcible entry and detainer. (Formerly HSB 116.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Passed House (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseAmendment H-8306 filed
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 744.
2019-04-26HouseSenate amendment H-1317 filed. H.J. 1056.
2019-04-26HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1045.
2019-04-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1156.
2019-04-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1156.
2019-04-26SenateAmendment S-3157 out of order. S.J. 1155.
2019-04-26SenateAmendment S-3245 filed, adopted. S.J. 1155.
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for SF 463. S.J. 1155.
2019-04-11SenateAmendment S-3157 filed. S.J. 940.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-03-28SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 463. S.J. 794.
2019-03-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 794.
2019-03-28HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2019-04-26HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1055.
2019-03-28HousePassed House, yeas 64, nays 33. H.J. 680.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 409.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1053 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB116 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
SF463 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1156.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback