IA HF636 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to urban revitalization areas by authorizing a property tax exemption for certain vacant commercial property, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 413) (See Cmte. Bill HF 690)
Title
A bill for an act relating to urban revitalization areas by authorizing a property tax exemption for certain vacant commercial property, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 413) (See Cmte. Bill HF 690)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-20 | Subcommittee, Grassley, Kajtazovic, and Soderberg. H.J. 1096. | |
2011-03-23 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 605. |