IA HF627 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1030.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the crime of the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, including the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device committed against a person under eighteen years of age, and providing penalties.(Formerly HF 440.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the crime of the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, including the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device committed against a person under eighteen years of age, and providing penalties.(Formerly HF 440.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseRereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1030.
2023-03-14HouseFiscal note.
2023-03-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 502.

Same As/Similar To

SF222 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 276.
HF440 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 627.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback