IA HF625 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation, including retailers maintaining a place of business in this state for purposes of sales and use taxes, agreements relating to the collection of sales and use taxes, sales of tangible personal property and services to state agencies, modifying the school tuition organization income tax credit, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 225) Effective 7-1-13, with exception of Division II, effective 6-11-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation, including retailers maintaining a place of business in this state for purposes of sales and use taxes, agreements relating to the collection of sales and use taxes, sales of tangible personal property and services to state agencies, modifying the school tuition organization income tax credit, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 225) Effective 7-1-13, with exception of Division II, effective 6-11-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1114. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1114. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1062. |
2013-05-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1109. |
2013-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1111. |
2013-05-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 1099. |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1462. H.J. 1099. |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate amendment H-1462 filed. H.J. 1097. |
2013-05-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1095. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1045. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 1044. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3266 adopted. S.J. 1043. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3266 filed. S.J. 1043. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1043. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Seng, Feenstra, and Hogg. S.J. 857. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Feenstra, and Seng. S.J. 830. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 774. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 774. |
2013-04-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 783. |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 2. H.J. 765. |
2013-04-08 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2013-04-08 | House | Amendment H-1254 withdrawn. H.J. 765. |
2013-04-05 | House | Amendment H-1254 filed. H.J. 761. |
2013-04-05 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 759. |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 748. |