IA HF619 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 778.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 778.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the department of natural resources to establish certain fees at state parks and recreation areas. (Formerly HF 510 & HSB 166.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the department of natural resources to establish certain fees at state parks and recreation areas. (Formerly HF 510 & HSB 166.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 778. |
2018-04-11 | House | SF 2389 substituted. H.J. 773. |
2018-04-11 | House | Amendments H-1405 and H-8006 out of order. H.J. 773. |
2018-04-11 | House | Amendment H-8335 adopted. H.J. 773. |
2018-04-11 | House | Amendment H-8199 withdrawn. H.J. 773. |
2018-03-27 | House | Amendment H-8335 filed. H.J. 691. |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8199 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment H-8006 filed. H.J. 233. |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee recomends passage and placed on the calendar. H.J. 233. |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Maxwell, Bergan and Prichard. H.J. 149. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20. |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment H-1405 filed. H.J. 1098. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 807. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB166 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 487.
HF510 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 778.
HF510 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 778.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF619 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF619.html |