IA HF617 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to Iowa utilities board review of specified provisions and utility ratemaking procedures. (Formerly HSB 191.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to Iowa utilities board review of specified provisions and utility ratemaking procedures. (Formerly HSB 191.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1041.
2023-05-09HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
2023-05-02SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1007.
2023-05-01HouseImmediate message. H.J. 950.
2023-05-03HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
2023-05-03HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
2023-05-02HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 978.
2023-05-01HousePassed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 924.
2023-05-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1299. H.J. 924.
2023-04-24HouseSenate amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 905.
2023-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 903.
2023-04-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 915.
2023-04-20SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 911.
2023-04-20SenateAmendment S-3140 adopted, as amended. S.J. 911.
2023-04-20SenateAmendment S-3168 to S-3140 filed, adopted. S.J. 911.
2023-04-17SenateAmendment S-3140 filed. S.J. 838.
2023-04-06SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747.
2023-03-21SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 647.
2023-03-15SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-03-14SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2023 1:30PM Room 315.
2023-03-14SenateSubcommittee: Brown, Giddens, and Klimesh. S.J. 570.
2023-03-13SenateRead first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 554.
2023-03-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 554.
2023-03-09HouseImmediate message. H.J. 596.
2023-03-09HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 578.
2023-03-03HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 494.

Same As/Similar To

HSB191 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 617.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF617
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF617.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/HF617.html
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230309_HJNL.pdf#578
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230321_SJNL.pdf#647
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230420_SJNL.pdf#911
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230501_HJNL.pdf#924
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230420_SJNL.pdf#910
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#647
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#910
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#911

Bill Comments

feedback