IA HF617 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the department of agriculture and land stewardship’s administration of certain functions, relating to forest and fruit tree reservation requirements, the name of the state soil conservation committee, financing of soil conservation and water quality practices, the health of agricultural animals, issuance of two-year licenses and the collection of related fees imposed upon persons engaged in the marketing of agricultural animals and mining operations, license fees imposed upon pesticide dealers, tickets for delivering commodities in bulk, labeling of motor fuel pumps dispensing certain ethanol blended gasoline, the use of scales, providing for penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 550 & HSB 120.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the department of agriculture and land stewardship’s administration of certain functions, relating to forest and fruit tree reservation requirements, the name of the state soil conservation committee, financing of soil conservation and water quality practices, the health of agricultural animals, issuance of two-year licenses and the collection of related fees imposed upon persons engaged in the marketing of agricultural animals and mining operations, license fees imposed upon pesticide dealers, tickets for delivering commodities in bulk, labeling of motor fuel pumps dispensing certain ethanol blended gasoline, the use of scales, providing for penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 550 & HSB 120.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1087. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1073. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 1072. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1001. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Behn, Dotzler, and Schultz. S.J. 902. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 861. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 861. |
2017-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 863. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 855. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 798. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB120 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 483.
HF550 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 863.
HF550 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 863.