IA HF616 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to property tax credits and assessment by modifying filing deadline provisions, modifying requirements relating to property assessment notices and equalization order notices, modifying provisions relating to property assessment protests and assessor informal reviews, and including effective date and applicability provisions. Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to property tax credits and assessment by modifying filing deadline provisions, modifying requirements relating to property assessment notices and equalization order notices, modifying provisions relating to property assessment protests and assessor informal reviews, and including effective date and applicability provisions. Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-15 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1168. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1113. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 4. S.J. 1111. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3229. S.J. 1111. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3229. S.J. 1109. |
2015-06-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1166. |
2015-06-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 92, nays none. H.J. 1161. |
2015-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1382, as amended. H.J. 1161. |
2015-06-05 | House | Amendment H-1400 to Senate amendment H-1382 filed, adopted. H.J. 1161. |
2015-06-05 | House | Amendment H-1393 to Senate amendment H-1382 withdrawn. H.J. 1161. |
2015-06-04 | House | Amendment H-1393 filed. H.J. 1152. |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate amendment H-1382 filed. H.J. 1124. |
2015-06-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1118. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1057. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 1. S.J. 1057. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3177 as amended, adopted. S.J. 1056. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3203 filed, adopted. S.J. 1056. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3177 filed. S.J. 1019. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1018. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 830. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 792. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 792. |
2015-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 841. |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 767. |
2015-04-03 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 752. |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 722. |