IA HF599 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 953.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 953.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of specified gas and electric utilities. (Formerly HSB 192.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of specified gas and electric utilities. (Formerly HSB 192.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 953. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951. |
2023-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 891. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 888. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 888. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 535. S.J. 887. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 535. S.J. 573. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 573. |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 620. |
2023-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 64, nays 33. H.J. 609. |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 491. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1157 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 535.
HSB192 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 599.
SF535 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 888.
HSB192 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 599.
SF535 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 888.