IA HF594 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to medical procedures including abortion and limitations regarding the withdrawal of a life-sustaining procedure from a minor child. (Formerly HF 233.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to medical procedures including abortion and limitations regarding the withdrawal of a life-sustaining procedure from a minor child. (Formerly HF 233.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-14HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 768.
2020-06-14SenateImmediate message. S.J. 842.
2020-06-14SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 16. S.J. 841.
2020-06-14SenateSenate concurred with S-5162. S.J. 841.
2020-06-13SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5162. S.J. 835.
2020-06-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 764.
2020-06-13HousePassed House, yeas 53, nays 42. H.J. 762.
2020-06-13HouseHouse concurred H-8312 as amended. H.J. 760.
2020-06-13HouseAmendment H-8314 to Senate amendment H-8312 adopted. H.J. 760.
2020-06-13HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 759.
2020-06-13HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8314 to Senate amendment H-8312. H.J. 758.
2020-06-13HousePoint of order raised on H-8314 to Senate amendment H-8312, ruled not germane. H.J. 758.
2020-06-13HouseAmendment H-8314 to Senate amendment H-8312 filed. H.J. 758.
2020-06-13HouseSenate amendment H-8312 filed. H.J. 758.
2020-06-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 755.
2020-06-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 813.
2020-06-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 812.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5151 filed, adopted. S.J. 811.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 938.
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 838.
2019-03-12SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Zaun. S.J. 594.
2019-03-12SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 573.
2019-03-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 573.
2019-03-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 496.
2019-03-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 496.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 491.
2019-03-11HouseAmendment H-1009 lost. H.J. 490.
2019-03-08HouseAmendment H-1009 filed. H.J. 476.
2019-03-04HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 388.

Same As/Similar To

HF233 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 497.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback