IA HF592 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers.(Formerly HF 517.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers.(Formerly HF 517.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203. |
2021-05-17 | House | Amendment H-1508 filed. H.J. 1141. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 877. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 474. |
Same As/Similar To
HF517 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
SSB1225 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557.
SF557 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
SSB1225 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557.
SF557 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF592 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF592.html |