IA HF592 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2019 8:45AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2019 8:45AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program by modifying provisions relating to eligibility, funding, and compulsory attendance and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 184.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program by modifying provisions relating to eligibility, funding, and compulsory attendance and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 184.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2019 8:45AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-19 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Brink, Kerr and Mascher. H.J. 417. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 388. |
Same As/Similar To
HF184 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 381.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF592 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF592.html |