IA HF59 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - NOBA: House Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - NOBA: House Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disabled veteran homestead tax credit by modifying eligibility criteria and credit amounts and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disabled veteran homestead tax credit by modifying eligibility criteria and credit amounts and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Vander Linden, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 262. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 99. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1123 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Subcommittee: Costello, Edler, and Ragan.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF59 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF59.html |