IA HF589 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Subcommittee, Bukta, May, and Wendt. H.J. 140.
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Subcommittee, Bukta, May, and Wendt. H.J. 140.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the school calendar and school start dates and providing effective and applicability dates. (Formerly HF 351)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the school calendar and school start dates and providing effective and applicability dates. (Formerly HF 351)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Subcommittee, Bukta, May, and Wendt. H.J. 140. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Education. H.J. 1447. | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment H-1180 filed. H.J. 850. | |
2009-03-09 | Amendments H-1124, H-1125, H-1126, and H-1127 filed. H.J. 713. | |
2009-03-06 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 699. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0633C&ga=83 |