IA HF569 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notice of garnishment and levy to a judgment debtor. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to notice of garnishment and levy to a judgment debtor. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 924. |
2015-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 845. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 863. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 862. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 835. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 774. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Garrett, and Quirmbach. S.J. 724. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 696. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 696. |
2015-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 687. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1107 adopted. H.J. 687. |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment H-1107 filed. H.J. 636. |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 496. |