IA HF567 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 159.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 159.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03. |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1014. |
2023-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 890. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 882. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 878. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 286. S.J. 877. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 286. S.J. 552. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 552. |
2023-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 596. |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 577. |
2023-03-09 | House | Amendment H-1042 adopted. H.J. 576. |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee amendment H-1042 filed. H.J. 499. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1136 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 286.
HSB159 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 567.
SF286 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 878.
HSB159 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 567.
SF286 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 878.