IA HF566 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to political subdivision elections by changing the date of the election of directors of local school districts, merged areas, and area education agency boards, by providing for the combined administration of regular and special school and city elections, making changes to the administration of elections for political subdivisions located in more than one county, establishing requirements for ballot arrangement and placement for political subdivision offices, and including effective date and applicability and transition provisions. (Formerly HF 166.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of Divisions I and II effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to political subdivision elections by changing the date of the election of directors of local school districts, merged areas, and area education agency boards, by providing for the combined administration of regular and special school and city elections, making changes to the administration of elections for political subdivisions located in more than one county, establishing requirements for ballot arrangement and placement for political subdivision offices, and including effective date and applicability and transition provisions. (Formerly HF 166.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of Divisions I and II effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 904. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 925. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 36, nays 13. S.J. 924. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3292 filed, lost. S.J. 924. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 832. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Chapman, and Danielson. S.J. 800. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 739. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 739. |
2017-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 754. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 68 nays 31. H.J. 750. |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1183 adopted. H.J. 750. |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1183 filed. H.J. 628. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 556. |
Same As/Similar To
HF166 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 754.