IA HF563 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the boards of directors of school districts to appoint student liaisons to the boards. (See HF 704.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the boards of directors of school districts to appoint student liaisons to the boards. (See HF 704.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Gassman, A. Meyer and Steckman. H.J. 400. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 376. |
Same As/Similar To
HF704 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Education. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF563 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF563.html |