IA HF544 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the sales price of lodging supplies sold to a lodging provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the sales price of lodging supplies sold to a lodging provider.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseFiscal note.
2023-03-14HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
2023-03-09HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 12:30PM House Lounge.
2023-03-08HouseSubcommittee: Johnson, Isenhart and Osmundson. H.J. 561.
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 455.

Same As/Similar To

SF394 (Similar To) 2023-04-13 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback