IA HF542 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1079.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1079.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to family support programs and provisions including those relating to child support and establishment of paternity. (Formerly HSB 126)
Title
A bill for an act relating to family support programs and provisions including those relating to child support and establishment of paternity. (Formerly HSB 126)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1079. |
2015-04-02 | House | Amendment H-1178 filed. H.J. 751. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Anderson, and Rogers. H.J. 633. |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 491. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF542 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF542.html |