IA HF541 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 7:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 7:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to ballots for school board elections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to ballots for school board elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 7:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled). |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Gjerde and Sexton. H.J. 548. |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 400. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF541 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF541.html |