IA HF536 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 787. |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 787. |
2015-03-30 | House | Chief Clerk's report on correction in enrollment. H.J. 729. |
2015-03-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 671. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 675. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 674. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 373. S.J. 674. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 373. S.J. 629. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 629. |
2015-03-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 604. |
2015-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 632. |
2015-03-17 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 598. |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee amendment H-1024 adopted. H.J. 598. |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment H-1024 filed. H.J. 501. |
2015-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 487. |