IA HF529 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the removal of vehicles or debris from highways, including payment of associated costs and blue lights on involved towing or recovery vehicles.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the removal of vehicles or debris from highways, including payment of associated costs and blue lights on involved towing or recovery vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Bagniewski and Gerhold. H.J. 71. |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 453. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF529 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF529.html |