IA HF529 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for conformity with federal law relating to civil penalties for violations of the state occupational safety and health law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 145.) Effective 4-12-17.
Title
A bill for an act providing for conformity with federal law relating to civil penalties for violations of the state occupational safety and health law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 145.) Effective 4-12-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 829. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 844. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 842. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 818. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Brown, and Dotzler. S.J. 755. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 586. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 586. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 0. H.J. 623. |
2017-03-08 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 515. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB145 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 486.