IA HF519 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 918.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 918.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public safety on highways, including the use of electronic communication devices while driving where such use results in death and the establishment of a statewide sobriety and drug monitoring program, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 109.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public safety on highways, including the use of electronic communication devices while driving where such use results in death and the establishment of a statewide sobriety and drug monitoring program, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 109.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 918. |
2017-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Nunn, Gaskill and Vander Linden. H.J. 543. |
2017-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 508. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB109 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 454.
SSB1101 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF444 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043.
SSB1101 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF444 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF519 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF519.html |