IA HF507 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 976.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 976.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain delinquent accounts for wastewater, sewer system, storm water drainage, and sewage treatment services. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain delinquent accounts for wastewater, sewer system, storm water drainage, and sewage treatment services. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 976. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 927. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 927. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 919. |
2015-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 914. |
2015-04-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 913. |
2015-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1235. H.J. 913. |
2015-04-15 | House | Senate amendment H-1235 filed. H.J. 865. |
2015-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 846. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 878. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays none. S.J. 875. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3093 adopted. S.J. 875. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 835. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3093 filed. S.J. 775. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 775. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee, Taylor, Bisignano, and Breitbach. S.J. 714. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 695. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 695. |
2015-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 685. |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 473. |