IA HF500 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adoption of the audiology and speech language pathology interstate compact.(Formerly HSB 122.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adoption of the audiology and speech language pathology interstate compact.(Formerly HSB 122.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 3:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 470. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 438. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 438. |
2021-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 519. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1204. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 513. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 378. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB122 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.