IA HF5 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 178.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act expanding the health care professional recruitment program.(See HF 196.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act expanding the health care professional recruitment program.(See HF 196.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 178.
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
2021-01-13HouseSubcommittee: Bossman, Kerr and Winckler. H.J. 87.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 40.

Same As/Similar To

HF196 (Similar To) 2021-01-22 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 187.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback