IA HF498 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practices of performing rights societies. (Formerly HSB 180.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practices of performing rights societies. (Formerly HSB 180.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 622. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 731. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 12:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Koelker, and Mathis. S.J. 664. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 548. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 548. |
2021-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 630. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 628. |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment H-1105 adopted. H.J. 627. |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment H-1105 filed. H.J. 535. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 378. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB180 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 372.