IA HF493 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the right of residents, owners, tenants, and landlords to summon emergency assistance and preempting related local ordinances, rules, and regulations. (Formerly HSB 153)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the right of residents, owners, tenants, and landlords to summon emergency assistance and preempting related local ordinances, rules, and regulations. (Formerly HSB 153)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 806. |
2016-04-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 774. |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 773. |
2016-04-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8170. H.J. 773. |
2016-04-06 | House | Senate amendment H-8170 filed. H.J. 609. |
2016-04-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 604. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 642. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 641. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5085 as amended, adopted. S.J. 641. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5115 to S-5085 filed, adopted. S.J. 641. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 558. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5085 filed. S.J. 501. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 501. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Committee. S.J. 0. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Quirmbach, and Schneider. S.J. 740. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 703. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 703. |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 704. |
2015-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 704. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 700. |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1150 adopted. H.J. 700. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1150 filed. H.J. 693. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 463. |