IA HF490 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 470.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 470.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of campaign signs by candidates and political committees for federal office and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 151.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of campaign signs by candidates and political committees for federal office and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 151.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 470. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 398. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 398. |
2021-02-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 454. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 376. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB151 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 334.