IA HF486 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to community catalyst building remediation grants for emergency projects. (Formerly HSB 91.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to community catalyst building remediation grants for emergency projects. (Formerly HSB 91.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 997. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1085. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1085. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 776. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, R. Smith, and T. Taylor. S.J. 695. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 622. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 622. |
2019-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 549. |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 542. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 339. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB91 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, approving bill. H.J. 315.