IA HF484 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 829.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 829.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the beginning farmer tax credit program, by modifying participation and lease agreement requirements and tax credit amounts, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 167; See HF 694.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the beginning farmer tax credit program, by modifying participation and lease agreement requirements and tax credit amounts, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 167; See HF 694.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 829. |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 694. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 535. |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, Maxwell and Wolfe. H.J. 384. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 375. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB167 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 484.
SSB1144 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 360.
SF360 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Fiscal note.
HF694 (Similar To) 2021-03-30 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 715.
SSB1144 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 360.
SF360 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Fiscal note.
HF694 (Similar To) 2021-03-30 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 715.