IA HF463 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the enforcement of motor vehicle laws and the regulation of commercial motor vehicles and certain operators by the department of transportation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 69.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of section 4 effective 5-11-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the enforcement of motor vehicle laws and the regulation of commercial motor vehicles and certain operators by the department of transportation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 69.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of section 4 effective 5-11-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148. |
2017-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1119. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1118. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 42, nays 6. S.J. 1117. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3386. S.J. 1117. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3386. S.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 43. H.J. 1105. |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1295 as amended. H.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1424 to Senate amendment H-1295 filed, adopted. H.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1421 to Senate amendment H-1295 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-04 | House | Senate amendment H-1295 filed. H.J. 880. |
2017-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 868. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 872. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 9. S.J. 871. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3283 filed, adopted. S.J. 871. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3281 filed, lost. S.J. 871. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3265 adopted. S.J. 870. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Substituted for SF 473. S.J. 870. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-3265 filed. S.J. 823. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 473. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2017-03-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 803. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays 8. H.J. 776. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1207 withdrawn. H.J. 775. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendments H-1208 and H-1206 adopted. H.J. 775. |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendments H-1206, H-1207 and H-1208 filed. H.J. 669. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1036 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB69 (Related) 2018-05-01 - NOBA: House Sub
SF473 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 872.
HSB69 (Related) 2018-05-01 - NOBA: House Sub
SF473 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 872.