IA HF462 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of railroad trains by a crew of two or more persons, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of railroad trains by a crew of two or more persons, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Hansen and Thorup. H.J. 111. |
2021-12-31 | House | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 8:00AM RM 19. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Hansen and Thorup. H.J. 384. |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 336. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF462 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF462.html |