IA HF46 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensing sanctions for certain governmental debts by restricting use of social security numbers.(See HF 774.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensing sanctions for certain governmental debts by restricting use of social security numbers.(See HF 774.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 774. |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 595. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Gjerde and Jones. H.J. 289. |
2021-01-20 | House | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 121. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 55. |
Same As/Similar To
HF774 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Dickey, and Dotzler. S.J. 63.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF46 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF46.html |