IA HF454 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Dawson. S.J. 470.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Dawson. S.J. 470.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 33.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 33.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Dawson. S.J. 470. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 68, nays 25. H.J. 406. |
2021-02-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 328. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB33 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 321.
SSB1051 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Lykam.
SSB1051 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Lykam.