IA HF453 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the imposition of certain requirements on nonprofit corporations by state agencies or state officials. (Formerly HSB 30.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the imposition of certain requirements on nonprofit corporations by state agencies or state officials. (Formerly HSB 30.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209. |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1022. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 975. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 971. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 719. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2021 11:00AM RM 111. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Giddens, and R. Smith. S.J. 664. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 597. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 597. |
2021-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 716. |
2021-03-16 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 737. |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 708. |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1133 adopted. H.J. 707. |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment H-1133 filed. H.J. 646. |
2021-02-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 328. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB30 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.