IA HF453 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to veterans preferences in certain appointments made by counties and cities and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 123)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to veterans preferences in certain appointments made by counties and cities and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 123)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-31SenateEND OF 2013 ACTIONS
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 827.
2013-04-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
2013-03-19SenateSubcommittee, Horn, Ragan, and Rozenboom. S.J. 595.
2013-03-13SenateRead first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 544.
2013-03-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 544.
2013-03-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 543.
2013-03-13HousePassed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 535.
2013-03-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 425.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback