IA HF448 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act designating certain county flood mitigation activities as an essential county purpose.
Title
A bill for an act designating certain county flood mitigation activities as an essential county purpose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 2:30PM RM 19. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Stoltenberg, Cooling and Henderson. H.J. 197. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 3:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Henderson, Amos Jr. and Stoltenberg. H.J. 435. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 425. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1052 (Related) 2023-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF448 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF448.html |