IA HF438 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized expenditures for housing assistance from the veterans trust fund. (Formerly HF 131; See HF 636.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized expenditures for housing assistance from the veterans trust fund. (Formerly HF 131; See HF 636.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1074. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 982. |
2017-03-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Highfill, T. Taylor and Worthan. H.J. 756. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 466. |
Same As/Similar To
HF131 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
HF636 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064.
HF636 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF438 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF438.html |