IA HF431 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the provision of audio-only telehealth or telemedicine by health care professionals.(Formerly HF 88.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the provision of audio-only telehealth or telemedicine by health care professionals.(Formerly HF 88.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 669.
2021-03-17SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-16SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 12:30PM RM 111.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee: Costello, Mathis, and Sweeney. S.J. 446.
2021-02-17SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 366.
2021-02-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 366.
2021-02-16HouseImmediate message. H.J. 437.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 546.
2021-02-17HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 466.
2021-02-16HousePassed House, yeas 92 nays none. H.J. 424.
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 309.

Same As/Similar To

HF88 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback