IA HF419 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county. (Formerly HSB 40.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county. (Formerly HSB 40.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 622. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 384. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2022 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Goodwin, Quirmbach, and Sinclair. S.J. 99. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/21/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Quirmbach, and R. Smith. S.J. 767. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 721. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Guth, and T. Taylor. S.J. 683. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 674. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 674. |
2021-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 776. |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 7. H.J. 769. |
2021-03-23 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 769. |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1237 adopted. H.J. 769. |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1237 filed. H.J. 763. |
2021-02-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB40 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 292.