IA HF416 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to support of a child including support relative to the child's completion of high school graduation or equivalency requirements.(Formerly HF 11.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to support of a child including support relative to the child's completion of high school graduation or equivalency requirements.(Formerly HF 11.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3156 filed. S.J. 889. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 889. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 2:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Reichman. S.J. 445. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 423. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
HF11 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.