IA HF415 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 416.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 416.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring school districts and certain accredited nonpublic schools to administer the pledge of allegiance and to display the United States flag in the classroom during the recitation of the pledge of allegiance. (Formerly HSB 155, HF 104.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring school districts and certain accredited nonpublic schools to administer the pledge of allegiance and to display the United States flag in the classroom during the recitation of the pledge of allegiance. (Formerly HSB 155, HF 104.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 416. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 3. H.J. 405. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment H-1037 adopted. H.J. 404. |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment H-1037 filed. H.J. 335. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
HF104 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
HSB155 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 301.
HSB155 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 301.